Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chemung Canal Trust Company, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Dale, Kimberlee Jean, against Alberta Henries, Daniel H. Henries, in the jurisdiction of Yates County, NY, . Yates County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYates County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 17, 2021ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 11, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 17, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: September 17, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order and Judgement |
||
September 17, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Exparte |
||
September 17, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service |
||
September 17, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Retail Instalment Contract |
||
September 17, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint |
||
September 17, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) 3215 Affidavits of Service |
||
September 17, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Letter |
||
September 17, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Bill of Costs |
||
September 17, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Statement of Account |
||
September 17, 2021 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.