Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Terry Cole, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rapp, Jessica Jean, against Beverly Stevenson, Shawn Rowser, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph Cassidy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph Cassidy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Nuisance) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
COMPLAINT
Date: March 16, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 16, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 16, 2021SUMMONS
Date: March 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: March 16, 2021ASSIGNED RJI
Date: March 16, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: March 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 29, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 05, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 24, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 24, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 10, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 06, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 16, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 15, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 18, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: November 15, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 03, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S)
Date: July 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S)
Date: July 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 24, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Affidavit of Service | ||
November 16, 2021 | Notice of Entry with Judgment attached | ||
November 15, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 15, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 15, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 15, 2021 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
October 18, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 04, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Additional Mailing Receipt to Beverly Stevenson affidavit of service |
||
September 29, 2021 | Affidavit of Service- Beverly Stevenson | ||
September 29, 2021 | Affidavit of Service- Shawn Rowser |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.