Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against S And W Tours & Charters Llc, Wayne E Lebarge, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 09, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: March 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 01, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 04, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: May 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: May 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
May 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 04, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 16, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
March 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 09, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.