Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
A A, A.A. O B O, Nada Hazim Jalil O B O A.A., Nada H Jalil, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Betz, Edward Allen, against City Of Ogdensburg, City Ogdensburg, represented by Lawyer, Robert Roy, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ANSWER
Date: February 28, 2020JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
Date: July 19, 2022ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: August 18, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 18, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 19, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: January 23, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 28, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 11, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
August 18, 2022 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER OF REFERRAL: ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) SCHEDULING ORDER WITH PCSO |
||
August 18, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 20, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT LETTER FROM HON. MARY M. FARLEY, J.S.C. (PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE W/PCSO & SAMPLE ADR ORDER WITH 4TH J LETTER FROM HON. MARY M. FARLEY, J.S.C. (PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE W/PCSO & SAMPLE ADR ORDER WITH 4TH J ... show more |
||
July 19, 2022 | JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE | ||
July 19, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 28, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
February 28, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 11, 2018 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
December 11, 2018 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.