Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Farm Credit East, Aca, Successor By Merger To First Pioneer Farm Credit Aca,, Successor By Merger To First Pioneer Farm Credit Aca,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Radel, Patrick Gerard, against As Administrator Of The Estate Of Jerry S. Poste, G. Stephen Poste, J&S Logging Inc., Patricia L. Poste As Administrator Of The Estate Of Jerry S. Poste, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
Date: October 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020SUMMONS
Date: December 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 02, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*
Date: January 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 13, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: January 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2021ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 26, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 13, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: December 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 13, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* Statement for Judgment |
||
January 12, 2021 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #1) ORDER AWARDING DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEYS' FEES |
||
January 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1) Supplemental Affirmation of Patrick G. Radel, Esq., re: Additional Attorneys' Fees |
||
January 11, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order Awarding Default Judgment and Attorneys' Fees |
||
January 11, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #1) Exhibit 12 - Schedule Attorneys' Fees |
||
January 08, 2021 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) FARLEY (Motion Part) Judge: HON MARY M FARLEY |
|
December 21, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service Via First Class Mail of Covid-19 Notice on all Defendants |
||
November 13, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) FARLEY (Motion Part) Judge: HON MARY M FARLEY |
|
October 27, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing with Letters to All Defendants rescheduling Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judg Affidavit of Mailing with Letters to All Defendants rescheduling Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judg ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.