Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jorge Manzano Peral, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Subin, Herbert S, against Good Trip Cab Corp. And Abdelmjid Bajeddi, represented by Mcevoy, John Philip, Moskovits, Ronit Z, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: April 12, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 15, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 14, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES - PRIOR TO CONVERSION (SUBSEQUENT)
Date: April 12, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 14, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 18, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 24, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS |
||
October 18, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 24, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
December 15, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 14, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
April 14, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 14, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 12, 2021 | STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
April 12, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES - PRIOR TO CONVERSION (SUBSEQUENT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.