Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Kathleen Dehring, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION DEBT COLLECTOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 23, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 23, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: November 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 22, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
July 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
July 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEBT COLLECTOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT COLLECTOR Redacted |
||
July 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
July 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
July 23, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
July 23, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
July 23, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted |
||
April 28, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.