Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lawrence, Peter Adel, Weisblatt, Stacey Allyson, against Angela Mowery-Bemus, Angela Mowery Bemus, J James Bemus, John Doe, Nys Taxation And Finance, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Ontario County. This case was filed in Ontario County Superior Courts with Craig J Doran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig J Doran Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2014 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE
Date: June 10, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: October 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #03)
Date: March 02, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: June 23, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #03)
Date: May 19, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 15, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: June 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #03)
Date: March 02, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: June 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #03)
Date: March 02, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 30, 2014LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 30, 2014SUPREME COURT TRANSMITTAL
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #03)
Date: March 02, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #03)
Date: March 02, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: October 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2022 |
FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM Foreclosure Action Surplus Form |
||
October 14, 2022 | Referee Report of Sale | ||
June 30, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
June 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
June 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE | ||
June 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 01, 2022 | Notice of Sale | ||
May 19, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #03) Extending time to conduct foreclosure sale and appointing substitute referee |
||
April 29, 2022 |
SUPREME COURT TRANSMITTAL Scheduling notice |
||
April 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.