Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Pb-67 Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Barr, Paul K., Fogel, Yitzchak Meir, against Linda Baumann As Executor Of The Estate Of Sylvia Dimet, Linda Baumann As Executor Of The Estate Of Wendy E. Dimet, Niagara Falls City School District, represented by Lema, Ryan Albert, Lowe, Amanda Louise, Morley, Mary Jane Rivington, Schnaars, Jeffrey Philip, Shaub, Jonathan Peter, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Mark Grisanti presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - D CVA Decisions and Orders Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 21, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 04, 2021DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Heffler Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Affidavit of Plaintiff Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 21, 2021COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 21, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: June 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 30, 2021SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2021SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: March 30, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 21, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 04, 2021DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT
Date: August 10, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 21, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 31, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: August 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 09, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 29, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 04, 2021ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: September 10, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 04, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 29, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 18, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 04, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: April 29, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 29, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: June 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: July 26, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: July 26, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 26, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 10, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 26, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: July 26, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 26, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: February 02, 2023TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED
Date: January 20, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
February 02, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
January 20, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) Signed |
||
January 20, 2023 | TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED | ||
November 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Transcript |
||
November 10, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 08, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
August 08, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Exhibit A - Decision & Order in McKinney v. Goins |
||
July 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Decision |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.