Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Seanna Bradley, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 02, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 24, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: September 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: February 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: September 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Buyer |
||
September 24, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) TMP#399770 |
||
September 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 24, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Seller |
||
September 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 24, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Orig Cred |
||
February 26, 2021 |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING Additional Mailing - Mailed 02/26/2021 |
||
February 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 02, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.