Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, Ostrowski, Melissa, against Stephen J. Fisher, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 26, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 11, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: March 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 09, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 11, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: January 11, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 11, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
||
January 11, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 11, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Verification |
||
January 11, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 09, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
March 09, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 05, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.