Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Carmelo Cruz, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Cavall, Diana B, Leta, Joseph Alexander, against Jennifer L Cruz, represented by Falvey, Julie, Millane, John Vaughan, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Frank A. Sedita presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank A. Sedita Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 07, 2015 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (Motion #5) | ||
September 16, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
June 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #5) | ||
June 22, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) *Corrected* | ||
June 22, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - C | ||
June 22, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - B | ||
June 22, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - A | ||
June 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION *Corrected* | ||
June 22, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 01, 2022 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #3) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.