Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Winston Flowers, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joseph, Michael H, Tait, John Vincent, against Cameron Clarke, Donnelly Mechanical Corp., represented by Dell, Gregory Joseph, Liu, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Danielle M Peterson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDanielle M Peterson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 18, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: September 29, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 19, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 08, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 16, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 29, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2021ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: September 14, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: December 09, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 13, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001) Defendant's Deposition Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: February 07, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: February 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: March 01, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation |
||
March 01, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
March 01, 2023 | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
February 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 07, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars Redacted |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript Redacted |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Photographs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.