Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, against Adam Fish, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: May 07, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 01, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 01, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 07, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: December 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION |
||
December 20, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
May 07, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
May 07, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF ADDITIONAL MAILING |
||
May 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 24, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DLTF399458 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.