Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Deery, Elizabeth Emily, Jakas, Joseph Karl, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Daniel Belzile, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts with Glen Bruening presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGlen Bruening Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 16, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 03, 2021ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 03, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 03, 2021NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT
Date: June 04, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 03, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 03, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 02, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - DANIEL BELZILE |
||
November 22, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
November 02, 2021 | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
November 02, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 02, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 01, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
June 04, 2021 |
NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE |
||
June 03, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.