Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Sheerin, John J, against Kristine A Tribou, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 04, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 26, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: February 18, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice Discontinuing Action with prejudice |
||
April 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 18, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Settlement |
||
January 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - KRISTINE A TRIBOU |
||
January 04, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
December 10, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
December 10, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.