Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Britnee Alexander, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Yaniv, Daniel, against Enchryl Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Kenneth F Case presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth F Case Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 26, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 26, 2021 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
July 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Judgment Granted Part 7 Judge: Case, Hon. Kenneth F. |
|
July 22, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
July 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned Part 7 Judge: Case, Hon. Kenneth F. |
|
July 21, 2021 | UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL PACKET - WITH CHILDREN | ||
July 21, 2021 | UCS - 111 | ||
July 21, 2021 | NYS CASE REGISTRY FILING FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.