Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Gunther, Tess E, against Robert Barrows, represented by Rodier, Ian Howard, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 25, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: April 28, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 19, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: July 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) SETTLEMENT STIPULATION |
||
May 19, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
April 28, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
April 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 25, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 24, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DLRB1012486 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.