Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ny Life Ins Co 401K, Ny Life Ins Co Pension Plan, Sharon Smith, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Laird Smith, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryFamily Law-Roseville |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2021 | |||
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Qualified Domestic Relations (QDRO) | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Entry of Judgment | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Dissolution | |
February 18, 2020 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
February 07, 2020 | Not Heard: Vacated | ||
February 07, 2020 | Heard: Settled | ||
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Appearance, Stipulations, and Waivers |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.