Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Langlois, Christopher P, against Brennen Carter, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: July 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 08, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 22, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: June 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 22, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: July 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
July 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 22, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
June 18, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
April 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 18, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.