Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mr Cooper, Nationstar Mortgage Llc, New Penn Financial Llc, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Linda M Farage, Midland Funding Llc, Midland Funding Of Delaware Llc, Nbt Bank National Association, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 23, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: April 23, 2018NOTICE OF SALE
Date: October 06, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF SALE
Date: November 12, 2021TERMS OF SALE
Date: November 12, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 23, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 17, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: November 12, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 23, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 23, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 21, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: July 23, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 23, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 26, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2021FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 17, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 23, 2021 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Firm Name |
||
November 12, 2021 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
November 12, 2021 | TERMS OF SALE | ||
November 12, 2021 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
November 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EF-28 Notice of Conversion to E-filing |
||
November 10, 2021 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
October 06, 2021 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
August 20, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Foreclosure COVID-19 Conference Status Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.