Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Crown Asset Management Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bann, Steven P, Stiller, Craig Scott, against Dotty Woollett, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIRMATION
Date: January 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 24, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: January 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 24, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 24, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
January 24, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 24, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
||
January 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
January 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
January 24, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 21, 2021 | NOTICE | ||
April 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.