Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, Ostrowski, Melissa, against Carolyn Picarazzi, Joelyn Carter, Joelyn Martin, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts with Grace Hanlon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrace Hanlon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 05, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S)  - a  (Motion #1) a/f provision Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 06, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 19, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 16, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
May 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
May 04, 2022 | ORDER - AWARDING FEE | ||
March 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) a/f provision Redacted per 22 NYCRR a/f provision Redacted |
||
March 31, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) attorney fees |
||
March 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - f (Motion #1) military verification |
||
March 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - d (Motion #1) aom |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.