Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
CategorySe - Set Aside |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
1635 - Distributee's Receipt Transaction 8787663 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-08-2021:15:35:17 |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8787672 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-08-2021:15:36:29 |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8392750 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-13-2021:14:28:21 |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
3240 - Ord Set Aside Est w/o Admin ORDER SETTING ASIDE ESTATE - Transaction 8392740 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-13-2021:14:27:24 |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
F140 - Adj Summary Judgment Extra Text: |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8383414 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-07-2021:15:06:56 |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 4/7/2021: Petition to Set Aside Estate without Administration. - Transaction 8383408 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-07-2021:15:06:05 |
|
April 07, 2021 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN D425 - Granted filed on: 04/07/2021 Extra Text: ZOOM/L.SCURLOCK (COURT CLERK)/L.SHAW (COURT REPORTER) 4/7/2021: Petition to Set Aside Estate without Administration. Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
April 07, 2021 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing Transaction 8337829 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-11-2021:13:00:08 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.