Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategorySe - Set Aside |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
F140 - Adj Summary Judgment Extra Text: |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
3240 - Ord Set Aside Est w/o Admin ORDER TO SET ASIDE ESTATE WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION - Transaction 8317092 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-26-2021:16:51:03 |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8317095 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-26-2021:16:51:59 |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 2/24/2021: Petition to Set Aside Estate without Administration. - Transaction 8310939 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-24-2021:12:44:21 |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8310931 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-24-2021:12:40:30 |
|
February 24, 2021 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN D425 - Granted filed on: 02/24/2021 Extra Text: ZOOM/L.SCURLOCK (COURT CLERK)/L.SHAW (COURT REPORTER) 2/24/2021: Petition to Set Aside Estate without Administration. Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8310941 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-24-2021:12:45:22 |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
4295 - Will 2/24/2021: Petition to Set Aside Estate without Administration. |
|
February 24, 2021 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
3625 - Pet Set Aside w/o Adm Transaction 8308410 - Approved By: RKWATKIN : 02-23-2021:13:18:36 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.