Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tamatha R. Schreinert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamatha R. Schreinert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryGb - Guardianship Of A Minor |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Hearing |
H788 - REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
3975 - Statement ... HEARING STATEMENT - Transaction 8754207 - Approved By: JBYE : 11-17-2021:13:09:21 |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8754367 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-17-2021:13:10:17 |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8449796 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-18-2021:09:12:38 |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
2720P - Ord Appt Guardian - Person Transaction 8449794 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-18-2021:09:11:47 |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8447705 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-17-2021:11:23:53 |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 5-13-21 GUARD - Transaction 8447699 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-17-2021:11:22:52 |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
F255 - Setld/Withdrn with Jud Conf/Hg Extra Text: |
|
May 13, 2021 | Hearing |
HP7 - PET/APPT/GDN/MINOR D425 - Granted filed on: 05/13/2021 Extra Text: NMILTON/JAVS/C4 Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
May 13, 2021 | Hearing |
HP7 - PET/APPT/GDN/MINOR - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.