Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with SHANNON, MASTER GREG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHANNON, MASTER GREG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2021 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2021 | Hearing |
H476 - MOTION TO MODIFY - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: MASTER SHANNON |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... NOTICE OF PROPOSED EXHIBITS - Transaction 8360200 - Approved By: CAGUILAR : 03-25-2021:09:27:33 |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8360347 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-25-2021:09:28:29 |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
2380 - Mtn to Modify ... MOTION FOR REVIEW AND MODIFICATION; NOTICE OF HEARING - Transaction 8338188 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 03-11-2021:14:29:22 |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8338279 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-11-2021:14:30:28 |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8334026 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-09-2021:16:34:34 |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
3720 - Proof of Service KEVIN J MASSEY 3/6/21 Transaction 8334022 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-09-2021:16:33:35 |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
2555 - Notice of Intent to Enforce... NOTICE OF INTENT TO ENFORCE CHILD SUPPORT ORDER - Transaction 8327935 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 03-05-2021:14:48:47 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.