Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tamatha R. Schreinert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamatha R. Schreinert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryJn - Joint Petition - No Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2021 | Hearing |
H185 - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8633303 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-07-2021:14:34:12 |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
2520 - Notice of Appearance JENNIFER MCMENOMY ESQ / MICHELLE VOGEL - Transaction 8633177 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 09-07-2021:14:33:05 |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8629838 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-03-2021:10:24:20 |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... ORDER FOR AUDIO/VISUAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Transaction 8629832 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-03-2021:10:23:20 |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8594012 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-13-2021:09:27:39 |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
1220 - Application for Default Application for Entry of Default - Transaction 8594007 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-13-2021:09:26:38 |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
2605 - Notice to Set AUGUST 3, 2021, 12:30 PM - Transaction 8549742 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 07-19-2021:11:25:01 |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... OF INTENT TO TAKE DEFAULT - Transaction 8549742 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 07-19-2021:11:25:01 |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8549863 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-19-2021:11:26:02 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.