Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Other Business Court Matters case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2021 |
CategoryOther Business Court Matters |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing: Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference
Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Special Motion for Dismiss Defendants' Tortious Interference Counterclaim, Motion to dismiss for Failure to State of Claim, and Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment on and Order Shortening Time Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order re: Hearing on 4/13/21 at 9:05 a.m. Department 16 Formal Request to Appear Telephonically Please be advised that pursuant to Administrative Orders 21-03, Department 16 will temporarily require all matters to be heard via remote appearance. The court is currently scheduling all remote conferences through BlueJeans, wherein you dial in by phone or connect online prior to your hearing to appear. Also, please check in with the Courtroom Clerk by 8:55 a.m. The call-in number or website is: Dial the following number: 1-408-419-1715 Meeting ID: 552 243 859 Online: https://bluejeans.com/552243859 To connect by phone, dial the telephone number, then the meeting ID, followed by #. PLEASE NOTE the following protocol each participant will be required to follow: Place your telephone on mute while waiting for your matter to be called. Do not place the conference on hold as it may play wait/hold music to others. Identify yourself before speaking each and every time as a record is being made. Please be mindful of sounds of rustling of papers or coughing. CLERK S NOTE: A copy of this Minute Order has been electronically served to all registered users on this case in the Eighth Judicial District Court Electronic Filing System. Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduling of Hearing Notice of Rescheduling Hearing |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Counter-Plainntiffs' Opposition to Counter-Defendant's Special Motion to Dismiss Tortious Interference Counterclaim, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, and Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment on an Order Shortening Time |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Jury Demand |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Association of Counsel Notice of Association of Counsel |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Shortening Time Plaintiff's Special Motion to Dismiss Defendants Tortious Interference Counterclaim Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Alternatively Motion for Summar (002) |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Business Court Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.