Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hawkins, Anthony, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Pro Se, against Johnson, Calvin, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Ballou, Erika presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBallou, Erika Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 8 [8] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 7 [7] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decision and Order Doc ID# 6 [6] Decision And Order |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus...Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus... The Court noted not parties present. Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus...Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus... Petitioner s Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on February 2, 2021 is hereby DISMISSED. This Court finds that Petitioner was released on parole on or around January 22, 2021. Therefore, Petitioner s petitioner is now moot since the Court cannot grant Petitioner any further relief. Anello v. Eighth Judicial Dist. Court ex rel. Cty. of Clark, No. 52085, 2008 WL 6113495, at *1 (Nev. Oct. 30, 2008). Moreover, Petitioner failed to show that he was entitled to an earlier release date of January 7, 2021. There is no constitutional or inherent right of a convicted person to be conditionally released [(i.e., on parole)] before the expiration of a valid sentence. Greenholtz v. Inmates of Neb. Penal Corr. Complex, 442 U.S. 1, 7 (1979) (emphasis added). Accordingly, Petitioner s Writ of Habeas Corpus is hereby DISMISSED; Attorney General's Office to prepare the order. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Ro'Shell Hurtado, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve; mail to: Anthony Hawkins, HDSP #91607, P.O.Box 650, Indian Springs, NV, 89070.//rh Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 5 [5] Clerk's Notice of Hearing |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 4 [4] Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Doc ID# 3 [3] Order For Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order The Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on March 18, 2021 was erroneously filed. COURT ORDERED, the Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus STRICKEN. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Ro'Shell Hurtado, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve.//rh Judge: Ballou, Erika |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.