Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Carli L. Kierny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarli L. Kierny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryCollection Of Accounts |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated Judge: Kierny, Carli |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order re: Pltf's Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Venue to Las Vegas Justice Court Having considered Plaintiff s Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Venue to Las Vegas Justice Court on OST, the Court rules as follows: Defendant is allegedly indebted to Plaintiff for the principal sum of $11,938.29, which does not exceed $15,000. Due to the fact that the amount in controversy is within the jurisdiction of Las Vegas Justice Court and not Clark County District Court, COURT ORDERED, motion is GRANTED pursuant to NRS 3.221 and NRS 4.370(1)(a). Ms. Moore to prepare the Order. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was distributed to: Sherry A. Moore, Esq., (zanvlit@zwickerpc.com). Judge: Kierny, Carli |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Venue to Las Vegas Justice Court on Order Shortening Time | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 2 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Carli Kierny |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure (NRS Chapter 19) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.