Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2020 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Property Should Not Be Taken from the Defendants and Delivered to the Plaintiff and for Writ of Possession
Judge: Barisich, Veronica M. |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Department 5 Formal Request to Appear REMOTELY for the January 12, 2021 Hearing Calendar. Please double check the docket for your start time. Please be advised that due to the COVID-19 pandemic, Department 5 will continue to conduct Court hearings REMOTELY using the Blue Jeans Video Conferencing system. You have the choice to appear either by phone or computer/video. Dial the following number: 1-408-419-1715 Meeting ID: 160 402 357 Meeting URL: https://bluejeans.com/160402357 To connect by phone dial the number provided and enter the meeting ID followed by # To connect by computer if you do NOT have the app, copy the URL link into a web browser. Google Chrome is preferred but not required. Once you are on the BlueJeans website click on Join with Browser which is located on the bottom of the page. Follow the instructions and prompts given by BlueJeans. You may also download the Blue Jeans app and join the meeting by entering the meeting ID PLEASE NOTE the following protocol each participant will be required to follow: Place your phone on MUTE while waiting for your matter to be called. Do NOT place the call on hold since some phones may play wait/hold music. Please do NOT use speaker phone as it causes a loud echo/ringing noise. Please state your name each time you speak so that the court recorder can capture a clear record. Please be mindful of rustling papers, background noise, and coughing or loud breathing. We encourage you to visit the Bluejeans.com website to get familiar with the Blue Jeans phone/videoconferencing system before your hearing. If your hearing gets continued to a different date after you have already received this minute order please note a new minute order will issue with a different meeting ID since the ID number changes with each meeting/hearing. Please be patient if you call in and we are in the middle of oral argument from a previous case. Your case should be called shortly. Again, please keep your phone or computer mic on MUTE until your case is called. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Kathryn Hansen-McDowell, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. 1/8/21km Judge: Barisich, Veronica M. |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 5 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Veronica M. Barisich |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service/Resident Agent | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service/Personal Guarantor | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Electronically Issued - Service Pending Summons |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Property Should Not Be Taken from the Defendants and Delivered to the Plaintiff and for Writ of Possession | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint for Breach of Contract, Claim and Delivery, and for Deficiency Balance and Breach of Personal Guarantee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.