Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Erika D. Ballou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErika D. Ballou Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Vacated Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Vacated Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order The Court GRANTS Respondent s MOTION TO DISMISS without prejudice pursuant to NRS 34.810(4) until such time as Plaintiff exhausts his administrative remedies relative to his claims. As of January 1, 2020, an inmate must first exhaust available administrative remedies before initiating a habeas petition challenging NDOC s computation of time credits pursuant to NRS 34.724 Plaintiff filed his petition after the effective date of the NRS 34.724 amendment. Further, P fails to allege or prove that he has exhausted his administrative remedies for his time credit claims prior to filing the instant petition. Thus, this Court cannot consider the petition and Plaintiff s petition must be dismissed without prejudice. Clerk s Note: A Copy of this was e-mailed to: Allison Herr, Dag [aherr@ag.nv.gov] and Rikki Garate, DAG [rgarate@g.nv.gov] A copy of this minute order was mailed to: Deondra McGregory #1230248, Florence Mcclure Women's Correctional Center, 4370 Smiley Road, Las Vegas NV 89115 (km 2/5/2021). Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notice of Hearing | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 24 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Erika D. Ballou |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Submission of Motion | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Inmate Filed - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.