Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Wells, Bob presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2013 |
CategoryJuvenile Non-Traffic (Ntsq) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time23 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Suspend Billing | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Check to Refer Case to Shasta | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Disclaimer | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Traffic Arraignment
Judge: Wells, Bob |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.