Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MAJESTIQUE MCCRIMMON VS GARY DWIGHT LEWIS
On May 29, 2015 a dissolution w/o minor children (general jurisdiction) case was filed by Mccrimmon Majestique, against Lewis Gary Dwight, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Randall F. Pacheco presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 02, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Other
Case Duration
2 years, 1 month and 30 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department S16, Pacheco, Randall, Presiding Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal/Sanctions - Held - Case Dismissed Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal/Sanctions - Held - Case Dismissed Judge: Pacheco Randall |
|
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
at 1:30 PM in Department S16, Pacheco, Randall, Presiding Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal/Sanctions - Held - Case Dismissed Judge: Randall |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Governor George Deukmejian Dept. - S16, Pacheco, Randall, Presiding FCCR Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion FCCR Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Pacheco Randall |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Dept. - S16, Pacheco, Randall, Presiding FCCR Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion Judge: Randall |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - FCCR Conference (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mccrimmon, Majestique - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-28 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | 4th Notice Sent/Assignment to Court (Entered Date: 03-30-17 ) | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Assigned to Court (Entered Date: 03-30-17 ) | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | 4th Notice Sent/Assignment to Court (Entered Date: 03-30-17 ) | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Assigned to Court (Entered Date: 03-30-17 ) | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice - FCCR Conference (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mccrimmon, Majestique - Filed and Entered on 2017-03-28 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Case Review Re: Default | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | 2nd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 03-24-16 ) | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | 2nd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 03-24-16 ) | |
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Governor George Deukmejian Dept. - 3101, Pacheco, Randall, Presiding Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Pacheco Randall |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Dept. - 3101, Pacheco, Randall, Presiding Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance Judge: Randall |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (- Scheduled & Notice Mailed on 2015-09-11 ) | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-17-15 ) | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mccrimmon, Majestique - Filed and Entered on 2015-09-11 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-17-15 ) | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (- Scheduled & Notice Mailed on 2015-09-11 ) | |
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mccrimmon, Majestique - Filed and Entered on 2015-09-11 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (of Marriage - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mccrimmon, Majestique - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mccrimmon, Majestique - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (of Marriage - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mccrimmon, Majestique - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (In Whole - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mccrimmon, Majestique - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mccrimmon, Majestique - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (of Marriage - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mccrimmon, Majestique - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (In Whole - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mccrimmon, Majestique - Granted on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mccrimmon, Majestique - Filed and Entered on 2015-05-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |