Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stephens Olivia Giddings, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Stephens Karl, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with John F. Walter presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions109 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time152 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice - Entry of Judgment (by pet - Filed and Entered on 2015-10-28 ) | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment (by pet - Filed and Entered on 2015-10-28 ) | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Governor George Deukmejian Dept. - S15, Chemeleski, John, Presiding Default Prove Up Trial - Judgment - Default After Prove Up Judge: John |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request - Default Setting (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Stephens, Olivia - Filed and Entered on 2015-09-25 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Stephens, Olivia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Stephens, Olivia - Filed and Entered on 2015-09-15 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Stephens, Olivia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Stephens, Olivia - Filed and Entered on 2015-07-20 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Stephens, Olivia - Filed and Entered on 2015-07-20 ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.