Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Navarro Lorena, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Ovando Sara Nineth, against Zepeda-Cuevas David, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Ana Maria Luna presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions238 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time180 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2022 | Proof of Service - Proof of Service - Mail | ||
April 22, 2022 | Hearing |
Department S14 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802 Hearing |
|
April 22, 2022 | Hearing |
Department S14 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802 Ex Parte Hearing |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Child |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply (Reply (Comment) ) Filed by Respondent |
|
March 21, 2022 | Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment) | ||
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ) Filed by Respondent |
|
March 17, 2022 | Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail | ||
March 17, 2022 | Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.