Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tucker Kevin Travis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tucker Delores Renee, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Randall F. Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions385 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time550 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tucker, Kevin - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-29 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tucker, Kevin - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-29 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tucker, Kevin - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tucker, Kevin - Filed and Entered on 2016-11-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Tucker, Delores ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Tucker, Delores ) Filed by Respondent |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Tucker, Delores ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Tucker, Delores ) Filed by Respondent |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Tucker, Delores ) Filed by Respondent Filed by Respondent |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Tucker, Delores ) Filed by Respondent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.