Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tencate Megan Rose, filed a(n) Dissolution - Commercial case against Moreno Raymond Seth, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with James D. Otto presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2012 |
CategoryJoint Petition For Summary Dissolution (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions238 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDissolution |
|
Case Cycle Time238 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (10/31 chambers ) | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (10/31 chambers ) | |
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tencate, Megan ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tencate, Megan ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
in Governor George Deukmejian Clerk's Office, Otto, James D., Presiding Hearing Hearing Judge: Otto James D. |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
at 8:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Clerk's Office, Otto, James D., Presiding Hearing Judge: James D. |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Megan Tencate, Raymond Moreno - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tencate, Megan - Granted on 2012-09-11 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (summary disso - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tencate, Megan - Filed and Entered on 2012-09-11 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Petition - Family Law Other (summary disso - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tencate, Megan - Filed and Entered on 2012-09-11 ) Filed by Petitioner PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Megan Tencate, Raymond Moreno - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Tencate, Megan - Granted on 2012-09-11 ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.