Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Seah, David, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Wilkinson, Troy M, against Rayford, Lalita, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Leonard D. Goldkind presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard D. Goldkind Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Time To Trial30 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions30 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned WRIT OF POSS RETURNED-PEACEFUL POSS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NCE |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED BUTTE CK 04658 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 658158 Fee Amount: 25.00 Entry Clerk: SWB 542 - $25.00 | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment COURT JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON LALITA RAYFORD Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL - MUNI COURT/CIVIL Notice Date: 2013-05-13 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 243 - JMT FOR PLTF Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: COURT TRIAL - MUNI COURT/CIVIL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memorandum MEMO TO SET FILED BY: PLTF (X) COURT 15 MINS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000 ANSWER- UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UNDER 10K) Fee Type: W1 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 225.00 Entry Clerk: NCE 541 - $225.00 |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver ORDER RE: WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS GRANTED AS TO LALITA RAYFORD Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: NCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.