Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Robert Alex, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Pro Per, against Campos, Joseph, Noe, Laura, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Time To Trial31 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions31 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time191 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $87.03 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS | |
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned WRIT OF POSS RETURNED-PEACEFUL POSS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED Fee Type: CA Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 643469 Fee Amount: 25.00 Entry Clerk: JMS 542 - $25.00 | |
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment COURT JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED BUTTE Fee Type: CA Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 643485 Fee Amount: 25.00 Entry Clerk: JMS 542 - $25.00 | |
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned WRIT OF POSS RETURNED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER Notice Date: 2013-01-15 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 243 - JMT FOR PLTF Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON LAURA NOE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON JOSEPH CAMPOS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.