Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Turner, Cathy, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Potter, Dirk, against Butterfield, Jack, Kenyon, Renee, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Leonard D. Goldkind presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions439 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time454 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (LR 4.6) Desc2: CONT FROM 2/14/13 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR/JUDGMENT ENTERED Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: SWB Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (LR 4.6) Notice Date: 2013-01-08 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG 3/28/13 Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: PBP Judge: Goldkind, Leonard D |
|
January 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: OSC RE: DISMISSAL (LR 4.6) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB | |
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT R KENYON Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMM/COMPL R KENYON Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
January 10, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMM/COMPL J BUTTERFILED SUB SVC Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Service Information Name: BUTTERFIELD, JACK PartyId: NC53340_2_200_2 Service Type: SUB Summons Date: 2012-01-04 00:00:00.0000000 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.