Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Butte County Credit Bureau, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Limited case represented by Driscol, Alfred W, Iii, against Plank, Joseph M, Plank, Teri A, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Barbara L. Roberts presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 1997 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Desc: APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION OF JMT DEBTOR Desc2: APPEARANCE ON BENCH WARRANT CONT Desc3: FROM 08/29/08 Disp Code: 344 - J/D SWORN/TESTIFIES OUTSIDE COURT Disp Clerk: VLA Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
August 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING 08/29/08 MINUTE ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
August 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION OF JMT DEBTOR Desc2: DEFT JOSEPH M PLANK SIGNED A PROMISE TO Desc3: APPEAR ON BENCH WARRANT Notice Date: 2008-08-05 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 09/26/08 Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: CLL Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION OF JMT DEBTOR DEFT JOSEPH M PLANK SIGNED A PROMISE TO Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL |
|
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Desc: APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION OF JMT DEBTOR Desc2: *AS TO JOSEPH PLANK**NEED PROOF OF Desc3: SERVICE Disp Code: 306 - CIVIL BENCH WARRANT ORDERED;FTA Disp Clerk: LBC Filing Clerk: VLA Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination Desc: APPEARANCE & EXAMINATION OF JMT DEBTOR Desc2: **SERVED ON 03/26/08** Disp Code: 905 - CONTINUED TO 05/30/08 Disp Clerk: VLA Filing Clerk: CLL Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OEX AS TO JOSEPH M PLANK TO JOSEPH M PLANK Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL | |
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Exam-Judgment Debtor APP & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE & EXAM OF JMT DEBTOR CK# 35252 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 425835 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: LBC 450 - $40.00 |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Generic Hearing Desc: BENCH WARRANT BY SHERIFF ON JOSEPH M Desc2: PLANK Disp Code: 383 - SWORN & EXCUSED FOR EXAMINATION Disp Clerk: SWB Filing Clerk: CLL Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED SERVED: 05/17/07 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.