Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kamer Michael, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Long Beach Legal John Feely, against Mark Gardner Group Llc, Garnder Mark, Gardner Michelle, Gardner Group Inc., represented by Menke Law Firm Apc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Michael P. Vicencia presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management163 days |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions675 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time675 days |
Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-12-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-30T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: October 04, 2016Brief
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Judgment
Date: May 05, 2017Answer
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: February 23, 2017Notice
Date: March 01, 2017Jury Instructions
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.