Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Public Benefit Corporationorange, Orange Coase Memorial Medical Center, A California Non-Profit Publicorange, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Offices Of Stephenson, against Medical Centerfountain Valley, Fountain Valley Regional Hospital And, Faily Choice Medical Group Inc., A California Coporationfamily, represented by Helton Law Group Apc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Michael P. Vicencia presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 14, 2015 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time298 days |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2015-06-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: December 24, 2015Notice of Motion
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: February 01, 2016Notice
Date: January 05, 2016Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: February 01, 2016Request for Dismissal
Date: March 07, 2016Notice of Settlement
Date: February 04, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.