Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Oec Shipping Los Angles Inc., Oec Shipping Los Angeles Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Taubman Simpson Young & Sulentor, Hawkins Roger Edward, against Lamipro Inc., Jeffrey Goeman An Individual, Jeffrey Goeman An, Goeman Jeffrey, Does 1 Through 10, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with James D. Otto presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management237 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2012 |
CategoryBreach Contrct/Warnty(Sellr Pltf) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions280 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc East District |
Case Cycle Time320 days |
Application
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2012-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2013-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord
Date: 2013-04-09T00:00:00Dismissal of Does
Date: August 20, 2013Notice of Continuance (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING )
Date: 2013-02-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed (SUMMONS ISSUED )
Date: 2012-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: September 27, 2013Default Entered
Date: August 23, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.