Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fuentes Williams F., filed a(n) Other Compl-Not Tort Or Complex (General Jurisdiction) case against Does 1 Through 100, Long Beach City Of, Officer S. Smock, represented by Calhoun John R. City Atorney, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Gary J. Ferrari presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 1996 |
CategoryOther Compl-Not Tort Or Complex (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Lack Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
April 02, 1997 | Docket Event |
in Department J, GARY J. FERRARI, Presiding OSC-Failure to Attend Stat. Conf. - Order of Dismissal Judge: GARY J. FERRARI |
|
February 11, 1997 | Docket Event |
in Department J, GARY J. FERRARI, Presiding Trial Setting Conference (OSC/FTA/DIS 4/2/97 830 SOJ) - Status Conference continued Judge: GARY J. FERRARI |
|
February 05, 1997 | Docket Event |
in Department J, GARY J. FERRARI, Presiding OSC-Failure to Attend Stat. Conf. (CALENDARED IN ERROR; TSC 2-6-97 1PSOJ) - Matter Placed Off Calendar Judge: GARY J. FERRARI |
|
December 20, 1996 | Hearing |
Order Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 17, 1996 | Docket Event |
in Department J, ARTHUR JEAN, Presiding Status Conference (OSC/DSMSL/SANCT 2-5-97 830 SOJ) - Status Conference continued Judge: ARTHUR JEAN |
|
December 17, 1996 | Docket Event |
in Department S, JAMES L. WRIGHT, Presiding Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Case Taken Under Submission Judge: JAMES L. WRIGHT |
|
November 22, 1996 | Hearing |
Order ( FOR PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO A PHYSICAL EXAMINATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
November 21, 1996 | Docket Event |
in Department S, Shapiro, do not use, Presiding Motion to Compel - Granted Judge: do not use |
|
November 01, 1996 | Hearing |
Proof of Service (** BY MAIL ** ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.