Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Blest, Cynthia, Quinzanos, Brianna, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Clare M. Maier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Order Approving Compromise of Minor's Claim | ||
September 14, 2023 | Notes | ||
September 13, 2023 | Notes | ||
September 07, 2023 |
*Hearing On Minor's Compromise
Judge: Maier, Clare |
||
September 07, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | N23-1162 CASE NAME: CLAIM OF: BRIANNA QUINZANOS *HEARING ON MINOR'S COMPROMISE FILED BY: BLEST, CYNTHIA *TENTATIVE RULING:* Petition for approval of compromise of claim is approved. No hearing require... | |
June 20, 2023 | Lodge Order/Judgment | ||
June 20, 2023 | Petition to Approve Compromise of Minor's Claim Filed | ||
June 20, 2023 | Miscellaneous Filing Re: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.