Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Csaa Insurance Exchange, filed a(n) case represented by Patterson, Keith E., against Depaula, Elistania C., in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Jill C. Fannin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
*Initial Petition Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Notice of/to:
Date: October 04, 2022Motion Filed To/For
Date: September 01, 2022Notice of/to:
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of/to:
Date: October 04, 2022Declaration of
Date: October 14, 2022Notice of/to:
Date: October 04, 2022*Hearing on Motion in Re:
Date: October 26, 2022Reply to:
Date: October 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minutes *Hearing on Motion in Re: compel enforcement of settlement agreement Judge: Fannin, Jill C |
|
October 26, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | N22-1819 CASE NAME: CSAA INSURANCE EXCHANGE VS. ELISTANIA DEPAULA *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: COMPEL ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED BY: *TENTATIVE RULING:* Petitioner CSAA Insurance Exchange’... | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply to plaintiff's Dec of attorney for petitioner in Opps to motion to enforce settlement Reply to: Reply to plaintiff's declaration of attorney for petitioner in opposition to motion to enforce settlement |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Attorney for petitioner in opposition to motion to enforce settlement Declaration of Atty for ptr in OPPOSITION to motion to enforce settlement |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Errata to Initiating Petition in Uninsured Motorist Claim Notice of/to: Errata to Initiating Petition in Uninsured Motorist Claim |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of/to: Hearing Notice of/to: Hearing |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of counsel of record Notice of/to: Counsel of Record |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of remote appearance Notice of/to: Remote Appearance |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Initial Petition Filed *Initial Petition Filed |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing Re: Motion Filed To/For to compel enforcement of settlement agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.