Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Unifund Ccr Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Resurgence Legal Group, against Erika Contreras, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with David E. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Certificate of Mailing
Date: November 09, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: November 09, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: September 22, 2021Court Default Packet
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of UNIFUND CCR LLC
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Declaration For Reimbursement of Costs (CCP 1033)
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Plaintiff's Summary of Case in Support of Default Judgment
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60
Date: September 22, 2021Plaintiffs Summary of Case in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Waiver of Attorney Fees in Support of Entry of Default Judgment (CC 1717.5)
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order: Default Judgment Review (Debt Buyer) – Non-Appearance
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Declaration of Declaration Regarding Order to Show Cause
Date: October 07, 2021Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Waiver of Attorney Fees in Support of Entry of Default Judgment [CC 1717.5]
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Declaration for Reimbursement of Costs (CCP 1033)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Court Default Judgment
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Proposed Debt-Buyer Court Default Judgment
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of UNIFUND CCR LLC and filed.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of UNIFUND CCR LLC
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92555.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.